U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00295
  • Case Name: USI Insurance Services LLC v. Randall
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 26, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Release Supersedeas Bond]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 24, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • August 24, 2017: [Release Supersedeas Bond]
  • August 24, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 18, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 06, 2017: [Application]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 21, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • June 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 02, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 01, 2017: [Show Cause]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 11, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Transcript]
  • February 17, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Supersedeas Bond Received]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • December 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 19, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 30, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 29, 2016: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • November 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 29, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 29, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • November 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.