U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00294
  • Case Name: Lew v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 06, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 18, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 02, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • November 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.