U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00283
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2141 Thorndike Avenue, Casper, Wyoming et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 12, 2017: [Set Aside]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 09, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 06, 2017: [Entry of Default]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Complaint]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 09, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.