U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00296
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Jims Water Service Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Consent Decree]
  • January 11, 2017: [Approve Consent Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.