U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00297
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 2314 E Primavera Loop, Mohave County, Fort Mohave, Arizona
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 12, 2017: [Set Aside]
  • February 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 12, 2017: [Order]
  • February 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 06, 2017: [Entry of Default]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Complaint]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.