U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00299
  • Case Name: Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Gavin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 29, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 05, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • May 02, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2017: [Entry of Default]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 13, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.