U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00301
  • Case Name: American National Property and Casualty Company v. Sam et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 15, 2019: [Opposition]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [Brief]
  • August 02, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Mandate]
  • May 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • March 26, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 13, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 22, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 22, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 15, 2017: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 15, 2017: [In Limine]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 25, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 11, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • October 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 27, 2017: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • September 25, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2017: [Counterclaim]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 07, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • January 25, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • January 12, 2017: [Response]
  • January 12, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • January 06, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 15, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.