U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00303
  • Case Name: Henry v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Staying Case]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Brief]
  • January 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 20, 2016: [Financial Entry]
  • December 16, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.