U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00302
  • Case Name: Engle v. Falloon Trucking LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Witness List]
  • December 07, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 08, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 07, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Reply Brief]
  • October 11, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • October 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 19, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 16, 2017: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Response]
  • May 18, 2017: [Response]
  • May 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • May 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 07, 2017: [Opposition]
  • May 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2017: [Affidavit]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • April 16, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 12, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Reply to Response]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 25, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.