U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00305
  • Case Name: Weeks v. Becker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 06, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Reply]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response]
  • June 13, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 24, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 16, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.