U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00306
  • Case Name: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Mandate]
  • February 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 12, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 06, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 05, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 05, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 04, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply Brief]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • April 25, 2018: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2018: [Response]
  • April 03, 2018: [Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 06, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Brief]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reply Brief]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 02, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 13, 2017: [Leave to]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 15, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • January 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Intervene]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order]
  • December 23, 2016: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • December 20, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.