U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00308
  • Case Name: Pappas v. Biomass Energy Enhancements LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • May 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • May 05, 2017: [Change Venue]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 04, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.