U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00309
  • Case Name: Kaiser-Francis Oil Company v. Noble Casing Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 16, 2017: [Witness List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Designation]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 08, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Oral Ruling on Motion]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 03, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 14, 2017: [Continue (Dispositive)]
  • April 12, 2017: [Reply]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 22, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 07, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 02, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 02, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2017: [Alias Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 10, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • January 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 20, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 20, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.