U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00311
  • Case Name: Kuiu, Inc. v. Eastmans' Publishing, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Statement]
  • August 07, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 07, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 07, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 07, 2017: [In Limine]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • June 23, 2017: [Exhibit/Witness List]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2017: [Consolidating Case]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 23, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.