U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Costa v. Home Depot USA Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 14, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • August 07, 2017: [Leave to]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 08, 2017: [Protective Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • May 31, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • April 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.