U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00319
  • Case Name: Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. et al v. United States Department of Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 06, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Status Report Order]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 26, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 29, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.