U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00315
  • Case Name: Cloud Peak Energy Inc. et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Errata]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Status Report Order]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Status Report]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 11, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 11, 2017: [Opposition]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 26, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 23, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • March 15, 2017: [Intervene]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2017: [Intervene]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 29, 2016: [Praecipe]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 29, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.