U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00321
  • Case Name: Chapman v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • February 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 22, 2017: [USCA Notification]
  • February 22, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 15, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 14, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 08, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 02, 2017: [Reconsideration]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Permanent Injunction]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.