U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00320
  • Case Name: Bird v. Wyoming Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Mandate]
  • May 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 08, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 08, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2019: [Reconsideration]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 20, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 20, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 20, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 22, 2017: [Strike]
  • March 16, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • March 16, 2017: [Response]
  • March 09, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 03, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 03, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 30, 2017: [Response]
  • January 09, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.