U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Belving v. Central Wyoming Rescue Mission et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Settlement Conference]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 20, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.