U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Park County Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Letter(s)]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Letter(s)]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Letter(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 02, 2017: [Letter(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.