U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Wick v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 19, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 12, 2018: [Strike]
  • February 09, 2018: [Reply Brief]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • February 08, 2018: [Response]
  • February 08, 2018: [Errata]
  • February 06, 2018: [Response]
  • February 02, 2018: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Reply to Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • January 26, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Leave to]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 07, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • November 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 31, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Return of Subpoena]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • August 08, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 25, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 10, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 30, 2017: [Compel]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Supersedeas Bond Received]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order]
  • February 08, 2017: [Application for Writ]
  • February 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.