U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00006
  • Case Name: Melikian v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 08, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Response]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 10, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 09, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.