U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Dunn v. Park County Sheriff's Office
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Brief]
  • July 24, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Praecipe]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Service of Process]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Service of Process]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.