U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Torres et al v. Sky Ridge Investments Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 20, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Strike]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.