U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Guy v. Lampert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 09, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • January 09, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 04, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 03, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Letter(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Opposition]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Reply]
  • August 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Response]
  • July 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • July 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 11, 2017: [Response]
  • July 03, 2017: [Opposition]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Leave to]
  • June 21, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • June 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 03, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • May 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 10, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2017: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 23, 2017: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • March 23, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
  • February 08, 2017: [Letter(s)]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • January 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2017: [Service of Process]
  • January 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.