U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Mulholland v. Wise Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 19, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 18, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • April 05, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 07, 2017: [Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Opposition]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.