U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Back et al v. Bank of America NA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • March 23, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • March 13, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 09, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 06, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • February 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Removal]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.