U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Mestas v. Evansville WY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Closing Case]
  • January 17, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 08, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 08, 2019: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Mandate]
  • October 01, 2019: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • October 01, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Transcript Letter]
  • February 09, 2018: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • February 09, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 28, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 18, 2017: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • December 15, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 15, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 15, 2017: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • December 07, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Needed) - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 06, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 06, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Exhibit]
  • November 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 20, 2017: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • October 20, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 20, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Brief]
  • October 19, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 15, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • October 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • October 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 08, 2017: [Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 11, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 10, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 09, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Compel]
  • July 27, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 18, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2017: [Reply]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 28, 2017: [Minute Order]
  • June 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2017: [Compel]
  • June 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 10, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • February 09, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.