U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Owner-Operator Services Inc v. McDonald et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 11, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Status Report Order]
February, 2017
  • February 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 27, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.