U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00019
  • Case Name: United States of America v. 109 Derr Avenue et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Continue (Dispositive)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Amended Notice of Appeal]
  • April 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 19, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2019: [Opposition]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 14, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 05, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 03, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 03, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Transcripts]
  • March 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Transcripts]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Stay Case]
  • March 08, 2018: [Stay Case]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 05, 2017: [Service by Publication]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 01, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2017: [Order]
  • April 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Order]
  • January 31, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.