U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Park County Detention Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 05, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Letter(s)]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 05, 2017: [Letter(s)]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 07, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 06, 2017: [Supplement]
  • April 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 24, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Strike]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 16, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 16, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 15, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Supplement]
  • March 14, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • March 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 13, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • February 08, 2017: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • February 07, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • February 07, 2017: [Consolidating Case]
  • February 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.