U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00022
  • Case Name: Melander et al v. Sptizer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Order]
  • February 06, 2017: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.