U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Garton v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Reply to Response]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 17, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order on 2255 Motion]
  • February 13, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.