U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Scottsdale Insurance Company et al v. Zakco Commercial Consultants Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 30, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2018: [Reply]
  • May 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2018: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • March 30, 2018: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2018: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 23, 2018: [Supplement]
  • March 22, 2018: [Substitute Party]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • February 23, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 12, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • February 12, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2018: [Third Party Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 22, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Suggestion of Death]
  • January 05, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 12, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 16, 2017: [Application]
  • June 08, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 19, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 19, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
  • May 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 18, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 17, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • April 10, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Complexity]
  • March 24, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • March 24, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • March 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • March 14, 2017: [Acceptance of Service]
  • March 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 13, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.