U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Fournier v. Strodtbeck
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Remanding Case to State Court]
  • February 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 16, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.