U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Payton v. Albany County School District No 1 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Reply]
  • January 22, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Brief]
  • January 08, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • November 20, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • November 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2017: [Strike]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [Protective Order]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 29, 2017: [Brief]
  • March 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Praecipe]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Praecipe]
  • February 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • February 17, 2017: [Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem]
  • February 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.