U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Dean v. Savage Services Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 19, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 22, 2018: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Reassigning Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 19, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 05, 2018: [In Limine]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 11, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 19, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • May 23, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 15, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 30, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 15, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 15, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • March 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.