U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Glenn v. Soderberg Masonry Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • February 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 11, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Letter(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 18, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 10, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 23, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • March 08, 2017: [Letter(s)]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 22, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.