U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Collins v. Gassner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2018: [Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 27, 2018: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 30, 2018: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 30, 2018: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 18, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Lift Stay]
  • January 16, 2018: [Lift Stay]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • April 12, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 05, 2017: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Vacate]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • March 08, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • March 08, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 08, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • March 07, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • March 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Removal]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 23, 2017: [Complaint]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.