U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:96-cv-00176
  • Case Name: Weldon v. WYDOC-SP-War, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [10th Circuit Filing]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 08, 2017: [USCA Order]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • May 08, 2017: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • May 08, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 13, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 12, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • April 12, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Brief]
  • February 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.