U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Short v. Wyoming Department of Corrections Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.