U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Farm Credit Services of America PCA et al v. Seven X Angus LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 03, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 06, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 06, 2017: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.