U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Campbell County Sheriff's Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [Dismiss Case]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 02, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • April 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.