U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Black v. Platte County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Martinez Report]
  • August 18, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 26, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Dismissing Party]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Response]
  • March 20, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 10, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 10, 2017: [Letter(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.