U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Severude v. New Albertsons Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • March 08, 2018: [Dismiss Case]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Opposition]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 29, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • December 26, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • December 15, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 15, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Witness List]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 01, 2017: [Financial Entry]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • April 25, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 14, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.