U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00045
  • Case Name: McCloskey v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 27, 2017: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 15, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.