U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00046
  • Case Name: North Fork Land & Cattle LLLP et al v. First American Title Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 26, 2017: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • June 05, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 25, 2017: [Status Report]
  • May 19, 2017: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • May 11, 2017: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 14, 2017: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • April 10, 2017: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 10, 2017: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • March 28, 2017: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 27, 2017: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • March 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 16, 2017: [Removal]
  • March 16, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.