U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Hawes v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 03, 2019: [Misdirected Appeal Document]
  • September 03, 2019: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 14, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 14, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 14, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 12, 2019: [Letter(s)]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Reply to Response]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Response]
  • April 17, 2019: [Lift Stay]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Letter(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • February 04, 2019: [Staying Case]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Letter(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Brief]
  • November 16, 2018: [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Mandate]
  • October 23, 2018: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • October 17, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
  • October 16, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • October 11, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 04, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2018: [Letter(s)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • March 05, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • March 01, 2018: [Letter(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 21, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 20, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • February 06, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 25, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Letter(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Letter(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Letter(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 18, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • October 04, 2017: [Designation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Hearing - Dispositive]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 01, 2017: [Reply to Response]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 23, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 23, 2017: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 21, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2017: [Response]
  • August 18, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 11, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2017: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 10, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2017: [Stay Case]
  • August 09, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 04, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 04, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Supplement]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response]
  • June 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Letter(s)]
  • April 11, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 11, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • April 05, 2017: [Letter(s)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 24, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.