U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Bird v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [USCA Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 13, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • February 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 11, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 03, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 03, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply to Response]
  • December 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 17, 2018: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • May 16, 2018: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • May 16, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • May 09, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 09, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 07, 2018: [Reply to Response]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • February 06, 2018: [Letter(s)]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 02, 2018: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 02, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Letter(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Supplement]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 23, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 14, 2017: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 27, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 27, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • July 18, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • June 16, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Leave to]
  • June 12, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • June 12, 2017: [Reply to Response]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Response]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • March 24, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.